McKnight, Russell Douglas (CPSO#: 27008)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Emergency Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998