McLachlin, Hugh Angus (CPSO#: 51169)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Sep 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
8637 COUNTY ROAD 91
Duntroon ON  L0M1H0
Phone: (705)428-6882
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

8637 County Road 91
Duntroon ON  L0M1H0
Canada
Phone: 705-428-6882
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hugh McLachlin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. McLachlin ( CPSO# 51169 )

Business Address:
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5P 3W2
Phone Number: (519) 631-2020

Business Address:
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone Number: (705) 445-2550

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUGH ANGUS MCLACHLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLACHLIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1984