McLachlin, Lauren Kathleen (CPSO#: 82696)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
1 Huron St.
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C3
Phone: (705) 445-2311
Fax: (705) 445-2313
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lauren McLachlin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. McLachlin ( CPSO# 82696 )

Business Address:
Collingwood General & Marine Hosp
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone Number: (705) 445-2550

Business Address:
Suite 206
1 Huron Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C3
Phone Number: (705) 445-2311

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAUREN KATHLEEN MCLACHLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLACHLIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2007