McLaren, Anya Therese (CPSO#: 95612)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Sleep and Pulmonary Centre
123 Edward Street, Suite 1011
Toronto, ON
M5G 1E2
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone: 416-813-2277
Fax: 416-260-3203
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 09 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANYA THERESE MCLAREN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLAREN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Sep 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2015