McLauchlin, Michelle Susanne (CPSO#: 70420)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Apr 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle McLauchlin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 1 2012

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: MD Health Medical Centre 186 Main Street South Brampton Ontario L6W 2E2 Tel: (905) 456-7774
Date Received: 31 Jan 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 08 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 25 Apr 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 25 Apr 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from April 25, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Michelle Susanne
            McLauchlin, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.
            McLauchlin to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. McLauchlin has ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions at
                  the current time.  

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 4, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)