McLaughlin, Caroline (CPSO#: 80788)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 28 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 29 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 16 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 07 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 08 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 24 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016