McLaughlin, John Adam (CPSO#: 103953)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Southern Illinois School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Eye Center of Northern Colorado
1725 East Prospect Road
Fort Collins, Colorado, 80525
Fort Collins CO  80525
United States
Phone: (970) 221-2222

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Colorado

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 03 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ADAM MCLAUGHLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLAUGHLIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 07 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2016