McLean, Alan Douglas (CPSO#: 59517)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
765 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2A8
Phone: (705) 253-6599
Fax: (705) 253-9668
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alan D. McLean Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. McLean ( CPSO# 59517 )

Business Address:
669 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2A6
Phone Number: (705) 949-6742

Business Address:
138B Gore Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C6
Phone Number: (705) 575-1306

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Business Address:
Suite 300
765 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2A8

Business Address:
860 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0B5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAN DOUGLAS MCLEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLEAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1990