McLean, Anthony Ray (CPSO#: 55516)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Feb 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Feb 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 501
2425 Bloor Street West
Etobicoke ON  M6S 4W4
Phone: (416) 767-8506
Fax: (416) 767-2403
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 530-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

West Side Specialist Centre
878 Brownsline
Etobicoke ON  M8W 3W2
Canada
Phone: (416) 503-0015
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. McLean Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. McLean ( CPSO# 55516 )

Business Address:
501 - 2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 4W4
Phone Number: (416) 767-8506

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 20 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY RAY MCLEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLEAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 1992