McLean, David Ross (CPSO#: 59980)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Sep 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 01 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Sep 1995