McLean, Deirdre Elizabeth (CPSO#: 65958)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 18 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Sep 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2015