McLean, Elizabeth Lea (CPSO#: 22789)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Mar 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010