McLean, Janet Lynda (CPSO#: 65352)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101-679 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone: (905) 836-1150
Fax: (905) 836-1281
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

York Medical Clinic
17215 Leslie St
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8E4
Canada
Phone: (905) 853-0404
Fax: (905) 853-3702
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANET LYNDA MCLEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLEAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1993