McLean, Jean Elizabeth (CPSO#: 52200)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. P. Moniz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Moniz ( CPSO# 30303 )
Dr. J. McLean ( CPSO# 52200 )

Business Address:
Suite 305
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 522-5231

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEAN ELIZABETH MCLEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLEAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 1986