McLean, Juanita Arline Gallaugher (CPSO#: 21112)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients requesting a copy of medical records may contact: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre - Medical Records Department.
Date Received: 21 Jun 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013