McLean, Michael (CPSO#: 41755)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 16 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Aug 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Nov 1985
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Nov 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 1999
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2014