McLean, Nicola Karin (CPSO#: 55582)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Nov 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Nov 1999

Summary

Former Name: Brough, Nicola Karin (used until: 15 Sep 1985 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Huron Hospital
24 Huron Street West
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Phone: (519) 225-2035
Fax: (519) 225-2700
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand Bend Area Community
Health Centre
69 Main Street East
Grand Bend ON  N0M 1T0
Canada
Phone: (519) 238-2362
Fax: (519) 238-6478
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

Alexandra Marine & General Hospital
Second Floor Clinic
120 Napier St.
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Canada
Phone: (519) 524-8323 Ext. 5208
Fax: (519) 524-8527
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
South Huron Hospital Exeter

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 07 Sep 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLA KARIN MCLEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLEAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Jan 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1999