McLean, Patrick Robert (CPSO#: 29383)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick Robert McLean Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 18 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Elliot LakeFamily Health Team 31 Nova Scotia Walk Elliot Lake ON P5A 1Y9 Tel: 705-848-3673
Date Received: 09 Sep 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017