McLean, Patsy Lou (CPSO#: 64000)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bayview Family Physicians
9160 Bayview Ave.
Suite 203
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 0E6
Phone: (905)8897997
Fax: (905) 8892666
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. McLean Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. McLean ( CPSO# 64000 )

Business Address:
Bayview Family Physicians
Suite 203
9160 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 0E6
Phone Number: (905) 889-7997

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATSY LOU MCLEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLEAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1992