McLean, Richard Finlay (CPSO#: 31944)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Aug 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 23-043
100 King Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1A2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 42030
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard F. McLean Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. McLean ( CPSO# 31944 )

Business Address:
100 King Street West
Suite 23-043
Hamilton ON  L8P 1A2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD FINLAY MCLEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLEAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1985