McLean, Ross Roper (CPSO#: 23621)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Perth Medical Clinic
14 Isabella Street
Perth ON  K7H 2W6
Phone: (613) 267-5528
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ross R. McLean Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 24 2011


Corporation Name: Ross R. McLean Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. McLean ( CPSO# 23621 )

Business Address:
Perth Medical Clinic
14 Isabella Street
Perth ON  K7H 2W6
Phone Number: (613) 267-5528

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSS ROPER MCLEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLEAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1971