McLellan, Kenneth Claude (CPSO#: 74405)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2nd Floor
633 Colborne Street
London ON  N6B 2V3
Phone: (519) 433-8834
Fax: (519) 433-8462
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McLellan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 12 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. McLellan ( CPSO# 74405 )

Business Address:
633 Colborne Street
2nd Floor
London ON  N6B 2V3
Phone Number: (519) 433-8834

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH CLAUDE MCLELLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLELLAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Nov 1999 to 12 Jan 2000
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jan 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2000