McLelland, Edwin Naldo (CPSO#: 30731)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. McLelland Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 16 2012


Corporation Name: Edwin McLelland Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 24 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Glazier Medical Centre 11 Gibb Street Oshawa ON L1H 2J9
Date Received: 05 May 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017