McLeod, Anne Gregersen (CPSO#: 65265)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
D 677
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5376
Fax: (416) 480-6753
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McLeod-Wells Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Wells ( CPSO# 64213 )
Dr. A. McLeod ( CPSO# 65265 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite T 2 - 006
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5376

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite D - 677
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5376

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 12 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE GREGERSEN MCLEOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLEOD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993