McLeod, David Angus (CPSO#: 22284)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 16 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1959
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2004