McLeod, Heather Christine (CPSO#: 82687)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare Hamilton
Fontbonne Building
Room F544A
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 34930
Fax: (905) 521-6068
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER CHRISTINE MCLEOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLEOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2010