McLeod, Jocelin Ann (CPSO#: 95598)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: Desjardins, Jocelin Ann (used until: 06 Feb 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
14 John Street North
Hamilton ON  L8R 1G9
Phone: (905) 546-0050
Fax: (905)-546-0030
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1221 Lakeshore Rd
Suite 103
Burlington ON  L7S 0A1
Canada
Phone: (905) 333-8393
Fax: (905) 333-9343
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

288 St Paul Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 3M9
Canada
Phone: (905) 684-9339
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

95 Darling Street
Brantford ON  N3T 3A4
Canada
Phone: 5197200712
Fax: 5197200713
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jocelin McLeod Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 12 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. McLeod ( CPSO# 95598 )

Business Address:
103 - 1221 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A1
Phone Number: (905) 333-8222

Business Address:
288 St. Paul Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 3M9
Phone Number: (905) 684-9339

Business Address:
95 Darling Street
Brantford ON  N3T 3A4
Phone Number: (519) 720-0712

Business Address:
14 John Street
Hamilton ON  L8R 1G9
Phone Number: (905) 546-0050

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Mar 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOCELIN ANN MCLEOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLEOD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2014