McLeod, Ryan Matthew (CPSO#: 92906)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rosedale Medical Group
280 Queenston Road
Hamilton ON  L8K 1H1
Phone: (905) 547-0508
Fax: (905) 547-6865
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: 905 845 2571
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ryan McLeod Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. McLeod ( CPSO# 92906 )

Business Address:
Rosedale Medical Group
280 Queenston Road
Hamilton ON  L8K 1H1
Phone Number: (905) 547-0508

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
327 Reynolds Street
Oakville ON  L6J 3L7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RYAN MATTHEW MCLEOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLEOD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012