McLorie, Gordon Arthur (CPSO#: 24257)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 05 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1971
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 2010