McManus, Ruth Marie (CPSO#: 51175)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6371
Fax: (519) 646-6372
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ruth McManus Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. McManus ( CPSO# 51175 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Suite A2115
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6371

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 06 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUTH MARIE MCMANUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMANUS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1984