McMaster, Jeffry James (CPSO#: 68260)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Addiction and Mental
Health - Queen Street Site
Unit 3-4
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 315-7494
Fax: (416) 583-4319
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Centre for Addiction & Mental
Health, Clarke Site
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Centre for Addiction & Mental
Health,Psychological Trauma Program
Suite 200
455 Spadina Avenue
Toronto ON  M5S 2G8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

204 Simcoe Avenue, Units 1 and 2
Keswick ON  L4P 3S6
Canada
Phone: (905) 476-3737
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

17310 Yonge Street, Unit 08
Newmarket ON  L3Y 7R8
Canada
Phone: (905) 868-9966
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffry McMaster Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. McMaster ( CPSO# 68260 )

Business Address:
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Queen Street Site
Unit 3-4 1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
455 Spadina Avenue
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 2G8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFRY JAMES MCMASTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMASTER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999