McMaster, Robert George (CPSO#: 86869)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1 - 3
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M5S 2G8
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 30195
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

105-1111 Finch Ave W
North York ON  M3J 2E5
Canada
Phone: 4167366279
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert McMaster Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. McMaster ( CPSO# 86869 )

Business Address:
Units 1 and 3
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M5S 2G8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
106 - 5460 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 6K7
Phone Number: (416) 901-5540

Business Address:
105 - 1111 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3J 2E5
Phone Number: (416) 736-6279

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT GEORGE MCMASTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMASTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2013