McMillan, Aimee Lydia May (CPSO#: 95109)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Nith Valley Family Practice
Unit 1
10 Waterloo Street
New Hamburg ON  N3A 1V5
Phone: (519) 662-1551
Fax: (519) 662-1402
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aimee McMillan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. McMillan ( CPSO# 95109 )

Business Address:
Nith Valley Family Practice
Suite 1
10 Waterloo Street
New Hamburg ON  N3A 1V5
Phone Number: (519) 662-1551

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AIMEE LYDIA MAY MCMILLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMILLAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013