McMillan, Neville Ansell (CPSO#: 42425)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 12 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 2014