McMillan, Stephen Jared (CPSO#: 85053)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 De Palma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone: (905) 377 7768
Fax: (905) 373-6935
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sanomed Clinic
1000 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5S 3A8
Canada
Phone: (416)915-9285
Fax: (416)915-9287
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The Medical Practice Walk-In Clinic
799 Bloor Street
Toronto ON  M6G 1L8
Canada
Phone: (647) 349-0053
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. J. McMillan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. McMillan ( CPSO# 85053 )

Business Address:
Sanomed Clinic
1000 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5S 3A8
Phone Number: (416) 915-9285

Business Address:
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 De Palma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN JARED MCMILLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMILLAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008