McMillan, William George (CPSO#: 64462)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495 Ext. 63123
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Walker Family Cancer Centre
Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 49150
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William G. McMillan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. McMillan ( CPSO# 64462 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 387-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 27 May 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM GEORGE MCMILLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMILLAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 24 Dec 1997
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1993