McMullen, William John Michael Mary (CPSO#: 29162)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Emergency Department
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Sudbury ON  P3E 3B5
Phone: (705) 674-3181 Ext. 4700
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

West Parry Sound Health Centre
Argyle NursingStation
Port Loring ON  P0H 1Y0
Canada
Phone: (705) 757-1717
County: Territorial District of Parry Sound
Electoral District: 08

Killarney Health Centre
Killarney ON  P0M 2A0
Canada
Phone: (705) 287-2300
County: Territorial District of Manitoulin
Electoral District: 08

825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola, ON
Espanola ON  P5E 1R4
Canada
Phone: (705) 869-1420
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William McMullen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. McMullen ( CPSO# 29162 )

Business Address:
34A Commissioner Street
Killarney ON  P0M 2A0
Phone Number: (705) 287-2300

Business Address:
Argyle Nursing Station
11851 Highway 522
Port Loring ON  P0H 1Y0
Phone Number: (705) 757-1717

Business Address:
Emergency Department HRSRH
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola ON  P5E 1R4
Phone Number: (705) 869-1420

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury
North Bay Regional Health Centre - Kirkwood Place Sudbury
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 20 Sep 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM JOHN MICHAEL MARY MCMULLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMULLEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1977