McMullin, Joseph Paul (CPSO#: 67797)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Hospital
Fontbonne Building
Room F533
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33134
Fax: (905) 521-6068
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. P. McMullin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. McMullin ( CPSO# 67797 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Hospital
Fontbonne Building
50 Charlton Avenue East
Room F533
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH PAUL MCMULLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMULLIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Jan 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Feb 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1999
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Jul 2000
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Nov 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2001