McNabb, Trudy Christina (CPSO#: 53992)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Apr 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
D2-829 Big Bay Point Rd
Barrie ON  L4N 0G5
Phone: (705) 721-1689
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Trudy C. McNabb Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. McNabb ( CPSO# 53992 )

Business Address:
Unit D2
829 Big Bay Point Road
Barrie ON  L4N 0G5
Phone Number: (705) 721-1689

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage and Retrieval Services 111 St Regis Crescent South North York, ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 416 398 0638
Date Received: 21 Mar 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRUDY CHRISTINA MCNABB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNABB is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1986