McNair, David James (CPSO#: 21645)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice

Medical Records Location

Address: Group Health Centre 240 MacNabb Street Sault Ste Marie ON P6B 1Y5
Date Received: 20 Jul 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 13 Mar 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 2017