Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

McNair, Susan Margaret (CPSO#: 57164)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Nov 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
346 Platts Lane
London ON  N6G 1J1
Phone: (519) 672-9660
Fax: (519) 672-7727
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan M. McNair Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. McNair ( CPSO# 57164 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Family Medical Centre
346 Platts Lane
London ON  N6G 1J1
Phone Number: (519) 672-9660

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN MARGARET MCNAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNAIR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 1987