McNair, Susan Mary Ann (CPSO#: 93307)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Community Psychiatry Clinic
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
100 West 5th St
Hamilton, ON
Hamilton ON  L9C 0E3
Phone: (905) 977-1126 Ext. 33538
Fax: (905) 521-6059
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Aug 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN MARY ANN MCNAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNAIR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 21 Jul 2011 to 20 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 21 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 21 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 10 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 11 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 10 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2015