McNally, Catherine Elizabeth (CPSO#: 69201)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 May 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 May 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Aug 1997 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Aug 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 May 2002