McNally, James Dayre (CPSO#: 87579)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Department of Paediatric
Critical Care Medicine
401 Smyth Road Room 3002C
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3553
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James Dayre McNally Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. McNally ( CPSO# 87579 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Paediatric
Critical Care Medicine
401 Smyth Road Room 3002C
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 727-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 29 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES DAYRE MCNALLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNALLY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 07 Jan 2008 to 01 Feb 2008
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 08 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 09 Sep 2009 to 08 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 09 Sep 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2010