McNamara, Brian Thompson (CPSO#: 57383)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Nov 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Nov 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 744-3311
Fax: (519) 340-0225
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

430 The Boardwalk
CPS Suite 206
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Canada
Phone: 519-741-5252
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian McNamara Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. McNamara ( CPSO# 57383 )

Business Address:
Unit 206
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 741-5252

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 25 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN THOMPSON MCNAMARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNAMARA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009