McNamara, Caroline Jane (CPSO#: 107700)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Oct 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 05 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:James Cook University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology and
Haematology
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-6560
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINE JANE MCNAMARA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. MCNAMARA is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. MCNAMARA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MCNAMARA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MCNAMARA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. MCNAMARA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. MCNAMARA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Aug 2015 to 14 Oct 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 15 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 01 Aug 2017
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 02 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2017