Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

McNamara, Martin Alexandre Joseph (CPSO#: 68923)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Mar 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St Andrew's Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone: (705) 526-3751 Ext. 5020
Fax: (705) 245-2373
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St. Andrews Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Canada
Phone: (705) 528-4368
Fax: (705) 245-2373
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McNamara Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 17 2008


Corporation Name: McNamara Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. McNamara ( CPSO# 68923 )

Business Address:
Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St. Andrew's Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-1300

Business Address:
103 - 240 Old Penetanguishene Road
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 528-4368

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN ALEXANDRE JOSEPH MCNAMARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNAMARA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 1998