McNamee, Ciaran Joseph (CPSO#: 43163)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Thoracic Surgery
75 Francis Street
Boston MA  02115
United States
Phone: (617) 732-7157
Fax: (617) 730-2853

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 15 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CIARAN JOSEPH MCNAMEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNAMEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 01 Oct 2002
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1990