McNaughton-Filion, Mary Louise (CPSO#: 58402)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Regional Supervising Coroner's Offi
2380 St. Laurent Blvd.
Ottawa ON  K1G 6C4
Phone: (613) 249-0055
Fax: (613) 249-0918
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1220 Place d'Orléans Dr
Orleans ON  K1C 7K3
Canada
Phone: 613-841-5389
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Oct 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY LOUISE MCNAUGHTON-FILION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNAUGHTON-FILION is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1988