McNeely, Michael Patrick (CPSO#: 77519)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
272 Oxford Street West
London ON  N6H 1S9
Phone: (519) 434-1112
Fax: (519) 434-7950
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael McNeely Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. McNeely ( CPSO# 77519 )

Business Address:
272 Oxford Street West
London ON  N6H 1S9
Phone Number: (519) 434-1112

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 06 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL PATRICK MCNEELY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNEELY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2008